TN SB1191 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 344
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a public institution of higher education in this state from hosting a Confucius Institute or accepting a gift from, or entering a contract with, a foreign source in certain circumstances; enacts other related provisions. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to higher education.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Brian Kelsey [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 344 | |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1238 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021