TN SB1187 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes from October 31 to October 1 the date by which the departments of education and health are required to jointly compile an annual report to the governor and the general assembly of self-administered medications and healthcare procedures. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, changes from October 31 to October 1 the date by which the departments of education and health are required to jointly compile an annual report to the governor and the general assembly of self-administered medications and healthcare procedures. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-03SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0769 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-17 - Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/25/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback