TN SB1184 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts information concerning adult victims of domestic abuse or sexual assault from being mandatorily reported by doctors and hospitals to law enforcement unless the patient consents to such reporting. - Amends TCA Section 38-1-101.
Title
As introduced, exempts information concerning adult victims of domestic abuse or sexual assault from being mandatorily reported by doctors and hospitals to law enforcement unless the patient consents to such reporting. - Amends TCA Section 38-1-101.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1334 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-26 - Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 2012
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1184&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB1184.pdf |