TN SB1179 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-08 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the prohibition on operating a needle and hypodermic syringe exchange program within 1,000 feet of a public park in certain counties and municipalities. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, relative to needle and hypodermic syringe exchange programs.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 21, Nays 8 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0128) |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health & Welfare to 3/24/21 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1088 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-21 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.