TN SB1179 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, negates mandatory application of certain laws on local governments that are not fully funded; prohibits an agency of state government from creating a new fee that will impact local governments in any year in which the general state revenues to the agency have decreased from the previous year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53; Title 10; Title 12; Title 41 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, negates mandatory application of certain laws on local governments that are not fully funded; prohibits an agency of state government from creating a new fee that will impact local governments in any year in which the general state revenues to the agency have decreased from the previous year. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9, Chapter 4, Part 53; Title 10; Title 12; Title 41 and Title 50.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1283 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee