TN SB1178 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires that the fees collected pursuant to the Postsecondary Education Authorization Act be separated from all other collections and expenditures of THEC. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 20.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires that the fees collected pursuant to the Postsecondary Education Authorization Act be separated from all other collections and expenditures of THEC. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 7, Part 20.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-16SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
2016-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2016
2015-02-18SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2015-02-12SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-02-12SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1150 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback