TN SB1178 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 376
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, allows a clerk to deny certain applications for registrations of motor vehicles when the applicant owes any motor vehicle registration fees to the office of the county clerk unless such applicant makes full payment on such fee amount; an optional clerk's fee of 10 percent of the fee amount owing may also be imposed and required. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 55 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, allows a clerk to deny certain applications for registrations of motor vehicles when the applicant owes any motor vehicle registration fees to the office of the county clerk unless such applicant makes full payment on such fee amount; an optional clerk's fee of 10 percent of the fee amount owing may also be imposed and required. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 55 and Title 67.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN HOUSE AMEND# 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - S. TRANS & SAFETY COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-22HousePub. Ch. 376
2013-05-22HouseEffective date(s) 05/06/2013
2013-05-06HouseSigned by Governor.
2013-04-25HouseTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-04-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2013-04-19HouseSigned by S. Speaker
2013-04-18HouseEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-04-16HouseS. concurred in H. am. 1
2013-04-15HousePlaced on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/16/2013
2013-04-15HouseS. Reset on Cal. for 4/16/2013
2013-04-11HousePlaced on Senate Message Calendar cal. for 4/15/2013
2013-04-11HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 83, Nays 1
2013-04-11HouseH. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0273)
2013-04-11HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2013-04-10SenateRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2013-04-08SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-04-08SenatePassed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0
2013-04-08SenateS. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0122)
2013-04-04SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/8/2013
2013-04-02SenateRec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm.
2013-03-27SenatePlaced on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/2/2013
2013-03-13SenateRec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. FW&M Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2013-03-07SenatePlaced on S. Trans & Safety Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013
2013-03-06SenateAction Def. in S. Trans & Safety Comm. to 3/13/2013
2013-03-01SenatePlaced on S. Trans Comm. cal. for 3/6/2013
2013-02-11SenateP2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
2013-02-07SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-02-06SenateFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0849 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 376

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback