TN SB1178 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. GW,H&HR Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, directs the commissioner of health to develop a plan for ensuring that 90 percent of pregnant women in this state have access to prenatal care and to report concerning such plan to the house health and human resources committee and the senate general welfare, health and human resources committee by February 1, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, directs the commissioner of health to develop a plan for ensuring that 90 percent of pregnant women in this state have access to prenatal care and to report concerning such plan to the house health and human resources committee and the senate general welfare, health and human resources committee by February 1, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-27 Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. GW,H&HR Comm.
2011-04-20 Placed on S. GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 4/27/2011
2011-04-18 Action Def. in S. GW,H&HR Comm. to last cal.
2011-04-14 R/S #83(8) to be heard in S. GW,H&HR Comm. 4/18/11
2011-04-14 Placed on S. GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 4/18/2011
2011-04-13 Action def. in S. GW,H&HR Comm. to 4/20/11
2011-04-07 Placed on S. GW,H&HR Comm. cal. for 4/13/2011
2011-02-23 P2C, ref. to S. GW,H&HR Comm.
2011-02-17 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-16 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1708 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-27 - Action Def. in Health & Human Resources Committee to 2012

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback