TN SB1175 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires schools, nursery schools, preschools, child care facilities, and public institutions of higher education to include information on immunization exemptions on any communications to students or parents regarding immunization requirements. - Amends TCA Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 4 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, Chapter 10, Part 4 and Title 49, relative to immunization.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] |
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-18 | Pub. Ch. 369 | |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-30 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 25, Nays 2 (Amendment 1 - HA0352) |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0352) |
2021-04-21 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-22 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0069) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1403 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 369