TN SB1170 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the amount of time a licensee's license may be suspended from a period not to exceed 60 days to a period not to exceed 90 days for selling, delivering, or giving away an alcohol vaporizing device. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As introduced, extends the amount of time a licensee's license may be suspended from a period not to exceed 60 days to a period not to exceed 90 days for selling, delivering, or giving away an alcohol vaporizing device. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-03 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2019-12-03 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1072 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.