TN SB1167 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a landlord to provide local governmental agencies responsible for enforcing building codes the landlord's email address in addition to the landlord's name, telephone number, and physical address. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 62 and Title 66.
Title
As introduced, requires a landlord to provide local governmental agencies responsible for enforcing building codes the landlord's email address in addition to the landlord's name, telephone number, and physical address. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 62 and Title 66.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0614 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Taken off notice for cal. in Commerce Committee