TN SB1166 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, rewrites the criminal offense of female genital mutilation; extends the statute of limitations for criminal prosecutions or civil actions for female genital mutilation. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, rewrites the criminal offense of female genital mutilation; extends the statute of limitations for criminal prosecutions or civil actions for female genital mutilation. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-03-19SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-18SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-03-18SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2019-03-18SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 3 - SA0105)
2019-03-18SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0104)
2019-03-18SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0103)
2019-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
2019-03-12SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-03-05SenateAction deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2019
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-21SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1364 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2019

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback