TN SB1161 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 503
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates a sales and use tax exemption on qualified building materials used in the construction, expansion, or renovation of one or more qualified, new, or expanded warehouse or distribution facilities, if the taxpayer or a lessor, or both, makes a capital investment of at least $1 billion in the construction or renovation of such facilities and related facilities at the same location within the qualified capital investment period. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates a sales and use tax exemption on qualified building materials used in the construction, expansion, or renovation of one or more qualified, new, or expanded warehouse or distribution facilities, if the taxpayer or a lessor, or both, makes a capital investment of at least $1 billion in the construction or renovation of such facilities and related facilities at the same location within the qualified capital investment period. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 503
2019-04-30SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-25SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019
2019-04-24SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019
2019-04-23SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019
2019-04-18SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019
2019-04-16SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/23/2019
2019-04-10SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/16/2019
2019-04-02SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means with negative recommendation, as amended
2019-03-26SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 4/2/2019
2019-03-26SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 4/2/2019
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-03-19SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/26/2019
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-02-19SenateRefer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1461 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 503

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback