TN SB1161 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the Tennessee emergency medical services board to study, on or before January 31, 2018, the practice of mobile integrated health care by emergency medical services personnel and its relationship to community paramedicine and report its findings and recommendations to the health and welfare committee of the senate and the health committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires the Tennessee emergency medical services board to study, on or before January 31, 2018, the practice of mobile integrated health care by emergency medical services personnel and its relationship to community paramedicine and report its findings and recommendations to the health and welfare committee of the senate and the health committee of the house of representatives. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 140.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2017-02-13SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-09SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1214 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback