TN SB1161 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 382
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates exemption from excise and franchise tax for entities owned by a branch of the U.S. armed forces that derive more than half of gross income from operation of facilities located on federally owned or leased property and operate primarily to benefit armed forces members. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2 and Title 67, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates exemption from excise and franchise tax for entities owned by a branch of the U.S. armed forces that derive more than half of gross income from operation of facilities located on federally owned or leased property and operate primarily to benefit armed forces members. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 2 and Title 67, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-03 Pub. Ch. 382
2011-06-03 Effective date(s) 06/01/11
2011-06-01 Signed by Governor.
2011-05-27 Transmitted to Gov. for action.
2011-05-26 Signed by H. Speaker
2011-05-25 Signed by S. Speaker
2011-05-25 Enrolled and ready for signatures
2011-05-21 Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 0
2011-05-21 Subst. for comp. HB.
2011-05-21 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2011-05-21 Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0
2011-05-20 Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 5/21/2011
2011-05-20 Rec. for pass., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 10, Nays 0 PNV 0
2011-05-20 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/20/2011
2011-05-19 Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/20/2011
2011-05-19 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/19/2011
2011-05-18 Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to 5/19/2011
2011-05-17 Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/18/2011
2011-04-25 Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/o recommend
2011-03-29 Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal.
2011-03-01 Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm.
2011-02-23 P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
2011-02-17 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-16 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB1203 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 382

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback