TN SB1158 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 282
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 282
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes certain guardians to place a security freeze on the consumer report of a person under 16 years of age or an incapacitated person; establishes requirements for such a freeze and remedies for violations. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 47 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, authorizes certain guardians to place a security freeze on the consumer report of a person under 16 years of age or an incapacitated person; establishes requirements for such a freeze and remedies for violations. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 47 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 282 | |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0776 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 282