TN SB1157 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 392
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, adds William R. Moore College of Technology as an eligible institution for receipt of dual enrollment grants. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, relative to dual enrollment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 392
2021-04-26SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2021-04-23SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/26/2021
2021-04-20SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021
2021-04-19SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/20/21
2021-04-07SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-03-31SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021
2021-03-31SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-11SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0471 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 392

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback