TN SB1152 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-13 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the holder of a retail food store wine license to hold a delivery service license for purposes of delivering sealed bottles of wine or beer to customers located off of the premises. - Amends TCA Section 57-3-224; Section 57-3-803 and Section 57-5-103.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 57-3-224; Section 57-3-803 and Section 57-5-103, relative to the delivery of alcoholic beverages and beer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to first calendar of 2022 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1359 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-06 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.