TN SB1147 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 519
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 519
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires an LEA to publish its curriculum on the LEA's website and to update curriculum changes at the beginning of each semester. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 2, relative to publishing curriculum.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 519 | |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0210 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022