TN SB1145 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, codifies and adds to rules of the fish and wildlife commission concerning activities that hinder public access to waters. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 102, Part 6; Title 69 and Title 70.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 102, Part 6; Title 69 and Title 70, relative to activities on the waters.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-06SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2023-02-02SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-31SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1009 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback