TN SB1142 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the board of examiners in psychology to submit its annual report to the governor in electronic form. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the board of examiners in psychology to submit its annual report to the governor in electronic form. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 33; Title 63 and Title 68.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2020-02-11SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2020-02-10SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2020-02-10SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0477)
2020-02-06SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/10/2020
2020-02-05SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0
2020-01-29SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/5/2020
2019-03-06SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/6/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1121 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-05 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Facilities, Licensure, & Regulations Subcommittee of Health Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback