TN SB1139 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires LEAs that maintain a website to provide information on training and professional development opportunities available to teachers evaluated using a growth portfolio model on the LEA's website. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires LEAs that maintain a website to provide information on training and professional development opportunities available to teachers evaluated using a growth portfolio model on the LEA's website. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0993 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education