TN SB1135 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a person to appeal to the state election commission the rejection of a provisional ballot; requires the ballot to be counted if the commission determines that the ballot was lawfully cast; requires the commission to promulgate rules establishing the procedures for an appeal. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a person to appeal to the state election commission the rejection of a provisional ballot; requires the ballot to be counted if the commission determines that the ballot was lawfully cast; requires the commission to promulgate rules establishing the procedures for an appeal. - Amends TCA Title 2.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/27/2018 |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/20/2018 |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0654 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-16 - Taken off notice for cal. in Local Government Committee