TN SB1124 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands definition of harassment and bullying in schools to include conduct based on actual or perceived demographic traits, requires review of anti-bullying policies at least once every three years, clarifies that such policies apply to students, school staff and volunteers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, expands definition of harassment and bullying in schools to include conduct based on actual or perceived demographic traits, requires review of anti-bullying policies at least once every three years, clarifies that such policies apply to students, school staff and volunteers. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] | Rep. Karen Camper [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/24/2014 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/19/2014 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 4/1/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0927 (Crossfiled) 2014-04-01 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1124&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1124.pdf |