TN SB1120 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a law enforcement officer to issue a citation in lieu of continued custody of a person arrested for a misdemeanor violation of simple possession of a controlled substance, unless the officer determines, based on the person's previous failure to appear in court, that a reasonable likelihood exists that the arrested person will fail to appear in court. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 40, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, requires a law enforcement officer to issue a citation in lieu of continued custody of a person arrested for a misdemeanor violation of simple possession of a controlled substance, unless the officer determines, based on the person's previous failure to appear in court, that a reasonable likelihood exists that the arrested person will fail to appear in court. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4 and Title 40, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Kyle [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee (Y: 2 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/3/2018 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0760 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration