TN SB1119 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 389
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends a 50 percent discount on camping fees at state parks to veterans who have a 100-percent permanent total service-connected disability. - Amends TCA Title 11.
Title
As enacted, extends a 50 percent discount on camping fees at state parks to veterans who have a 100-percent permanent total service-connected disability. - Amends TCA Title 11.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 389 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-30 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0080) |
2019-04-30 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0220) |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1004 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 389