TN SB1118 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-03 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-03 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes Warren County to participate in a pilot project utilizing convenient voting centers. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 3, Part 3, relative to convenient voting centers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-03 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Recalled from Clerk's Desk |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0863 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1118&ga=113 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/113/Bill/SB1118.pdf |