TN SB1118 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-22 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes issuance of United States army ranger license plates to active, retired, or honorably discharged U.S. Army Rangers; specifies documentation applicant for such plate must provide for issuance. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 4, to authorize issuance of United States army ranger license plates.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1387 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-16 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee