TN SB1118 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires funding of the BEP at the level of one ELL instructor for each 20 students who are English language learners and one ELL translator for each 200 students who are English language learners. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, requires funding of the BEP at the level of one ELL instructor for each 20 students who are English language learners and one ELL translator for each 200 students who are English language learners. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 3, Part 3.
Sponsors
Sen. James Kyle [D] | Rep. Jason Powell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 3/27/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0895 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-26 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Education Subcommittee of Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1118&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1118.pdf |