TN SB1112 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes electronic submission of the report from the commissioner of revenue to the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives regarding tax credits claimed for the gross premiums tax and job tax. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, authorizes electronic submission of the report from the commissioner of revenue to the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives regarding tax credits claimed for the gross premiums tax and job tax. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/23/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation, as amended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Refer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1266 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-03 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.