TN SB1109 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
Pending: Senate Energy, Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the relative of a pet's deceased owner to retrieve the animal from an animal control agency within seven days; requires the animal control agency to consider the animal as abandoned if a relative of the pet's deceased owner does not retrieve the animal from the agency within seven days of the owner's death. - Amends TCA Title 44; Title 63, Chapter 12 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 44; Title 63, Chapter 12 and Title 68, relative to animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0726 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-16 - Failed for lack of second in: Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee