TN SB1108 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes department of transportation to furnish electronically the quarterly report to each member of the general assembly on the status of highway projects in the county or counties that the member represents. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56 and Title 65.
Title
As introduced, authorizes department of transportation to furnish electronically the quarterly report to each member of the general assembly on the status of highway projects in the county or counties that the member represents. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 7; Title 54; Title 55; Title 56 and Title 65.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0276 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-31 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.