TN SB1107 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts the retail sale of food and food ingredients from the state sales tax for the period of May through October 2021. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, relative to the sales tax on food.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ negative recommendation |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1071 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.