TN SB1107 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Pub. Ch. 388
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, establishes requirements for the operation of electric foot scooters; specifies that for purposes of the DUI laws, an electric scooter will be considered a motor-driven vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 1; Title 55, Chapter 10; Title 55, Chapter 12 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Title
As enacted, establishes requirements for the operation of electric foot scooters; specifies that for purposes of the DUI laws, an electric scooter will be considered a motor-driven vehicle. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 1; Title 55, Chapter 10; Title 55, Chapter 12 and Title 55, Chapter 8.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 2 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | Pub. Ch. 388 | |
2019-05-15 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 2 - HA0475) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 2 for 5/1/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed H. as am., Ayes 72, Nays 18, PNV 1 |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Re-ref. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0475) |
2019-04-22 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-22 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0223) |
2019-04-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0280) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/22/19 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 4/10/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1220 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-15 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 388