TN SB1101 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Re-refer to Senate Education Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-15 - Re-refer to Senate Education Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires each LEA and public charter school to provide age-appropriate instruction to public school students on black history in the fifth and eighth grades; directs the department of education to provide LEAs and public charter schools with black history resources and materials. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 10, relative to curriculum.
Sponsors
Sen. Katrina Robinson [D] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Amend# 2 by Robinson (Y: 16 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1 (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-15 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Education Comm. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 2 - SA0195) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/8/2021 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0056) |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2021 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 1 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1460 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-27 - Withdrawn.