TN SB1097 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 185
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Public Participation Act," which creates a process by which a person may petition a court to dismiss a legal action that is based on the person's exercise of the right to free speech, right to petition, or right of association. - Amends TCA Title 20.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Public Participation Act," which creates a process by which a person may petition a court to dismiss a legal action that is based on the person's exercise of the right to free speech, right to petition, or right of association. - Amends TCA Title 20.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 185 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-08 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2019-04-08 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2019-03-21 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0777 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 185