TN SB1091 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes from July 1 to August 1 the date by which the department must submit its annual report of virtual education program operation, success, improvement efforts, and funding adequacy to the governor, the general assembly, the state board of education, and the BEP review committee. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, changes from July 1 to August 1 the date by which the department must submit its annual report of virtual education program operation, success, improvement efforts, and funding adequacy to the governor, the general assembly, the state board of education, and the BEP review committee. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1334 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee