TN SB1088 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes the attorney general and reporter's review of an emergency rule, from not disapproving solely on the basis of failure to meet statutory criteria to requiring that the attorney general not approve an emergency rule that does not meet statutory criteria for adoption. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 5, relative to emergency rules.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 291 | |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/7/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0567 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021