TN SB1087 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a person convicted of drag racing to serve a minimum of 48 consecutive hours in confinement; increases the period of time that the department of safety is required to revoke the driver license of a person convicted of drag racing, from one to two years. - Amends TCA Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40 and Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 5, relative to drag racing.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1341 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-09 - Sponsor(s) Added.