TN SB1079 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the Tennessee radiologic imaging and radiation therapy board of examiners to June 30, 2025. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 9.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 6, Part 9, relative to the Tennessee radiologic imaging and radiation therapy board of examiners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-09HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-07SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-04-07SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-05HousePassed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-04-05HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-18HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-03-15SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-15SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2021-03-11SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/15/2021
2021-03-10SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/10/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0492 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-05 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback