TN SB1078 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires the department to combine all moneys received and expenses incurred pursuant to the Tennessee Credit Services Businesses Act and the Uniform Debt-Management Services Act into a single fund for the purpose of administering the acts. - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 10 and Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 55.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 10 and Title 47, Chapter 18, Part 55, relative to consumer protection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-04-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-05HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-03-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-03-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-03-22HousePassed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
2021-03-22HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-03-22SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-22SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2021-03-18SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/22/2021
2021-03-16SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-09SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/16/2021
2021-03-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/16/2021
2021-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/9/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0728 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-22 - Comp. SB subst.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback