TN SB1076 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department to collect, maintain, and transmit to the children’s bureau within the United States department of health and human services data required or requested pursuant to federal law for programs focused on children’s welfare; requires the department to aggregate and publish the data on the department’s website. - Amends TCA Title 37.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 37, relative to department of children's services data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2023 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/29/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1303 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-21 - Def. to Summer Study in Civil Justice Committee