TN SB1075 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 05/18/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner to promulgate rules that take effect by July 1, 2021, to create a commercial use authorization to allow persons wanting to engage in commercial activities at state parks or state natural areas to obtain a permit to do so; specifies that the rules must include fees structured to promote park self-sufficiency and economic development. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 11, relative to the department of environment and conservation.
Sponsors
Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Effective date(s) 05/18/2021 | |
2021-05-21 | Pub. Ch. 482 | |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-05-03 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0253) |
2021-05-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0077) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0887 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 482