TN SB1074 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the polysomnography professional standards committee to June 30, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 31.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 63, Chapter 31, relative to the polysomnography professional standards committee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - SENATE GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 325 | |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/19/2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Government Operations Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Government Operations Committee calendar for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0493 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021