TN SB1070 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, limits foreign ownership of agricultural property in this state. - Amends TCA Title 43; Title 44; Title 47; Title 48 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 43; Title 44; Title 47; Title 48 and Title 66, relative to agricultural property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/1/2021 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2021 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1451 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Sponsor(s) Added.