TN SB1061 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on May 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires the department of correction, in partnership with the Tennessee higher education commission and the board of regents, to develop and submit to the general assembly an annual report detailing the higher education opportunities available to eligible incarcerated individuals in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 41; Title 49 and Title 50.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires the department of correction, in partnership with the Tennessee higher education commission and the board of regents, to develop and submit to the general assembly an annual report detailing the higher education opportunities available to eligible incarcerated individuals in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 41; Title 49 and Title 50.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-09 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 238
2019-04-15SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-11SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2019
2019-04-03SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-27SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/3/2019
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1303 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-09 - Pub. Ch. 238

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback