TN SB1058 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a cause of action against an employer for discharge or adverse employment action based solely on transportation or storage of a firearm or firearm ammunition in an employer parking lot. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 1.
Title
As enacted, creates a cause of action against an employer for discharge or adverse employment action based solely on transportation or storage of a firearm or firearm ammunition in an employer parking lot. - Amends TCA Title 50, Chapter 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Pub. Ch. 80 | |
2015-04-13 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-03-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 78, Nays 14 |
2015-03-23 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 5 |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/10/2015 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0994 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 80