TN SB1057 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee / no second
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that an applicant shall be deemed by the Tennessee regulatory authority to have satisfied all of the requirements necessary for approval of a state-issued certificate of franchise authority if the applicant has provided fiber-to-the-premises to at least 1,000 customers for a period of at least one year prior to the application. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, specifies that an applicant shall be deemed by the Tennessee regulatory authority to have satisfied all of the requirements necessary for approval of a state-issued certificate of franchise authority if the applicant has provided fiber-to-the-premises to at least 1,000 customers for a period of at least one year prior to the application. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 10; Title 65; Title 67 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Failed in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee / no second |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/13/2018 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0969 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-13 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee of Business and Utilities Committee