TN SB1045 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, specifies that hemp and products derived from hemp, other than isolated THC, are not subject to seizure based solely on their composition; prohibits police searches based solely on the odor of cannabis. - Amends TCA Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 43; Title 53 and Section 67-4-2802.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38; Title 39; Title 40; Title 43; Title 53 and Section 67-4-2802, relative to cannabis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-03-03SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/9/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1568 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-01 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback