TN SB1045 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, prohibits persons from loitering or conducting any commercial activity in, or in proximity to, the median of a state highway; creates a Class C misdemeanor offense that requires issuance of a warning citation for a first offense; creates certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, prohibits persons from loitering or conducting any commercial activity in, or in proximity to, the median of a state highway; creates a Class C misdemeanor offense that requires issuance of a warning citation for a first offense; creates certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01 Pub. Ch. 184
2019-05-01 Effective date(s) 07/01/2019
2019-04-23SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-16SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-15SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-11HousePassed H., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-11HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0224)
2019-04-11HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-08HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-04SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2019-04-04SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0181)
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 0
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0832 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 184

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback